OPENING DOORS LONDON

Charity number: 1167919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hitesh K Tailor Trustee 11 December 2019 None on record
Daniel Ricard Trustee 30 October 2020 None on record
ANNIE SOUTHERST Trustee 31 May 2016 None on record
JANET GUTHRIE Trustee 14 April 2016
AGE UK CAMDEN Received: On time
BRADLEY REBACK Trustee 30 October 2020
THE BRAD PHILLIPS CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
Paul Williamson Trustee 11 December 2019 None on record
Gemma Keenan Trustee 16 July 2018 None on record
RISHI MADLANI Trustee 21 April 2016
THE ROYAL ACADEMY OF DRAMATIC ART Received: On time
Julia Rachel Shelley Chair 14 April 2016
LAMBETH LINKS Recently registered