Financial history EMS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1167498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/06/2018 05/06/2019 05/06/2020 05/06/2021 05/06/2022
Total gross income £2.29k £0 £618 £0 £21.18k
Total expenditure £1.05k £332 £408 £444 £425
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A