Trustees ST JAMES COTTAGE NURSERY
Charity number: 1167643
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guy Reynolds | Chair | 02 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Anne Louise Hardy | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Marie Perry | Trustee | 14 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Wentworth | Trustee | 07 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Reeves | Trustee | 02 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNY SPENCE | Trustee | 08 October 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.