26TH ST HELENS (BLACKBROOK) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 508137
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £3.25k £2.31k £3.91k £8.63k £26.14k
Total expenditure £3.64k £3.70k £4.08k £8.96k £22.04k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A