Trustees ST. FAITH'S CHURCH, GAYWOOD, KING'S LYNN SINGLE CONGREGATION LOCAL ECUMENICAL PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1168610
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

22 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Ann Flint Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Richard Vernon Hooke Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Robin David Banham Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Tiffany Ridd Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Mbuthia Trustee 25 April 2023
None on record
Rev Michaela Alexandra Sorensen Trustee 27 September 2022
None on record
Susan Benstead Trustee 03 May 2022
None on record
Evelyn Nadar Trustee 20 July 2021
None on record
Chris Monica Sarah Ballard Trustee 27 October 2020
None on record
Rev Robert Llewelyn Roberts Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
RACHEL VERONICA VYSE Trustee 15 May 2018
WEST NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JOYCE ENID BANHAM Trustee 15 May 2018
None on record
RICHARD DAVID ARNOLD PARR Trustee 25 April 2017
THE FRIENDS OF ST FAITHS CHURCH GAYWOOD
Received: On time
Andrew John Hiles Trustee 26 April 2016
WEST NORFOLK GILBERT AND SULLIVAN OPERATIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
WEST NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
KINGS LYNN FESTIVAL CHORUS
Received: On time
MATTHEW STEVENSON Trustee 26 April 2016
None on record
SARAH STEVENSON Trustee 26 April 2016
None on record
JOAN GREENING Trustee 26 April 2016
WEST NORFOLK METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
JOYCE ELLA STEVENS Trustee 26 April 2016
THE FRIENDS OF ST FAITHS CHURCH GAYWOOD
Received: On time
DAVID PHILIP GREENING Trustee 26 April 2016
CAMBRIDGE ORGANISTS ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
THE BARBIROLLI SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST FAITHS CHURCH GAYWOOD
Received: On time
ELIZABETH MARY JAMES Trustee 26 April 2016
KING'S LYNN CIVIC SOCIETY
Overdue by 24 days
SUSAN JANE McINTYRE CRANKO PAGE Trustee 26 April 2016
None on record
GILLIAN AUDREY HILES Trustee 26 April 2016
None on record