Accounts and annual returns THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER AND ST DAVID, FLEETWOOD

Charity number: 1168745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 22 May 2022 On time
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 February 2022 99 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 205 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 03 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 03 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 14 April 2019 165 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

14 April 2019 165 days late Download Open in new window