Accounts and annual returns NEUADD GYMUNEDOL TALOG SCE

Charity number: 1168863
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 November 2021 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 06 November 2021 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 January 2020 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 11 January 2020 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window