AHUS ALLIANCE GLOBAL ACTION

Charity number: 1167904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.00k £5.90k £1 £1.05k £2.41k
Total expenditure £0 £15.34k £2.56k £1.52k £247
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A