Accounts and annual returns IMMACULATE HEART OF MARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (IHOMSA)

Charity number: 1167473
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 August 2021 17 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2020 23 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 August 2019 16 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2019 16 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2018 25 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2018 25 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 August 2017 29 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window