Trustees SHREWSBURY CIVIC SOCIETY TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 508255
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Dinneen | Chair | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
David Shepherd | Trustee | 29 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jordanis Petridis | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Russell Game | Trustee | 31 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Martina Chamberlain | Trustee | 21 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CARTER | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
John Robert Brown | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Simon Beedles FRICS | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.