Governing document EDULIFE
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 27 OCT 2016 AMENDED ON 13 FEB 2017 as amended on 06 Dec 2019 as amended on 25 Mar 2020 as amended on 17 Dec 2021 as amended on 15 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
- The objects of the CIO are for the public benefit in Zambia, helping young people to move forward in their lives and assisting children and young people in particular, but not exclusively, by supporting their education through a scholarship programme; - Assisting and supporting materially, and in any other sense as the trustees see fit, all that which is needed to provide access to education and further training for their benefit and by supporting the Catholic Diocese of Monse, who work to support and care for the children and young people in the community; - Providing support with basic education, secondary education and further education, including teacher training and other vocational training.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.