Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FERRING, DIOCESE OF CHICHESTER
Charity number: 1168899
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John George Alexander Potter | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edmund Nicolas Young | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Harris | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SOPER | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Anne Mason | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Gompertz | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY HARRIS | Trustee | 30 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN PRATT | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|||||
SUSAN DOROTHY YOUNG | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE BAIRD | Trustee | 25 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JOHN HALL | Trustee | 23 April 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.