Financial history THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD AGAPE CENTRE HAVANT

Charity number: 1167951
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £16.15k £16.15k £13.91k £10.53k £14.36k
Total expenditure £14.12k £13.97k £7.97k £3.87k £16.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A