Trustees FRIENDS OF BRADLEY PARK
Charity number: 1168903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lincoln Adams | Chair | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevon Mohammed | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Murphy | Trustee | 15 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marlon Adams | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Donna Newton | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Smith | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Leah Patrice | Trustee | 13 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Cavanagh | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ivor Richards | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MANDY BOATSWAIN-TOMKIN | Trustee | 24 August 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.