EAST END CONNECTION

Charity number: 1169467
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 February 2021 23 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 29 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required