Trustees THE HASLEMERE PENNY HA'PENNY TRUST
Charity number: 1169411

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM CARTER | Chair | 29 September 2016 |
|
|||||
James Edwards | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Jerome Michael Frances Davidson | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
James Ian McMichael | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Jon Whiteley | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Rosemary Robini | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Helen Sara Louise Linnell | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Paul McMillan Dear | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|||||
JOHN STUART ORR | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|||||
BRIAN HOWARD MBE | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|||||
REV RICHARD TALBOT BODLE | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.