Financial history GATEWAY CHURCH WITHERNSEA

Charity number: 1171717
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £7.78k £9.80k £14.22k £15.74k £8.17k
Total expenditure £5.37k £10.92k £9.64k £11.23k £14.34k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A