Financial history WRAY EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 508468
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £7.25k £7.54k £8.21k £8.29k £8.20k
Total expenditure £7.39k £6.16k £8.84k £7.36k £8.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A