Financial history THE QUEEN'S COMMONWEALTH TRUST

Charity number: 1172107
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £2.79m £3.65m £796.76k £796.11k £980.23k
Total expenditure £1.47m £882.11k £1.45m £1.53m £1.69m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.79m £3.65m £641.53k £761.82k £946.77k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £141.00k £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £415 £3.79k £14.23k £34.29k £33.46k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.38m £706.33k £1.19m £1.22m £1.38m
Expenditure - Raising funds £90.78k £175.78k £259.60k £304.08k £304.24k
Expenditure - Governance £85.53k £74.92k £74.63k £103.70k £102.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £144.13k £250.51k £340.87k £415.99k £397.19k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0