Trustees SHIKOR (BD) WEST LONDON UK
Charity number: 1173024
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MD FEROZ HAYAT KHAN MA | Chair | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Zakir Hossain | Trustee | 20 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Badrudduza Chowdhury M.A | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Md Nurul Amin Majumder MCom | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Jashim Uddin B.A | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED IMAM UDDIN | Trustee | 23 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALI AHAMMED BSC Eng. | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED BELAL M.A | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.