Accounts and annual returns THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HANDSWORTH, ST MARY

Charity number: 1171344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 19 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 21 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 04 November 2019 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 04 November 2019 4 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 23 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 23 April 2018 On time Download Open in new window