Financial history NEW LIFE CHURCH RUGBY

Charity number: 1169454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £207.43k £213.51k £369.20k £427.10k £240.65k
Total expenditure £205.13k £212.35k £204.85k £181.19k £178.14k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A