Financial history BAHJA INITIATIVE

Charity number: 1169309
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £31.51k £23.53k £36.00k £26.09k £43.09k
Total expenditure £26.79k £25.35k £33.13k £19.17k £23.46k
Income from government contracts £5.87k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £5.00k £1.00k