WHY COMICS?

Charity number: 1172791
Charity reporting is overdue by 244 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Overdue by 244 days
Annual return 31 May 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 19 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 23 May 2019 112 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 23 May 2019 112 days late Download