FLAMES INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1169745
Charity reporting is overdue by 1131 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Accounts and TAR 19 October 2020 Overdue Overdue by 33 days
Annual return 19 October 2019 20 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 19 October 2019 20 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 18 October 2018 20 January 2020 155 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 October 2018 20 January 2020 155 days late Download
Annual return 17 October 2017 03 February 2019 170 days late
Accounts and TAR 17 October 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1131 days