Trustees WADHURST INSTITUTE, HALL AND FIELD
Charity number: 1169908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Nick Francis Mitchell | Chair | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Myles White | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Carter | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Ince | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Butler | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Garrett | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Watson | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Michael Humphrey | Trustee | 15 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Pocock | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert John Stovell | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Neal | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Anne Hay | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Roger Bishop | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Serena Jane Gadd | Trustee | 23 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.