Trustees HOARDINGUK LTD
Charity number: 1172719
Charity reporting is overdue by 95 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MEGAN KARNES | Chair | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Megan Karnes | Trustee | 17 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mandi Simms | Trustee | 17 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stuart Whomsley | Trustee | 18 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN CAROLE MURRAY | Trustee | 03 December 2015 |
|
|||||
SHARON DEGEN | Trustee | 09 June 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.