EASINGWOLD COMMUNITY LIBRARY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1170759
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 29 January 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 31 January 2019 On time Download