Trustees LANDYWOOD AND DISTRICT VOLUNTARY HELP CENTRE
Charity number: 508946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Libby Weaver | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
RUTH BATES | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN TALBOT | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
MIRIAM FORDE | Trustee | 04 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
TRISH TAYLOR | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANN MORAN | Trustee | 20 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
LYNN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARION CHERRINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET JOHNSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY OWEN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.