Trustees NAVNAT VANIK ASSOCIATION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM
Charity number: 1173042
Charity reporting is up to date (91 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DILIP VITHALJEE MITHANI | Chair | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
NATWARLAL MEHTA -NVM | Trustee | 12 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
KISHORCHANDRA VORA | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Shamir Sanghrajka | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
HARESH BHAILAL SHANGHAVI | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
SAROJ BHARAT VARIA | Trustee | 27 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
DIVYESH MANSUKHLAL KAMDAR | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
PARESHKUMAR PARSHOTAM MEHTA | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
KIRIT BATAVIA | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mahendrakumar Prabhudas Kothary | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
KETAN ADANI | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
HASUMATI VINODRAI DOSHI | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
BACHOOLAL CHUNILAL MEHTA | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BRODIE HOLDEN | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
NITIN MOHANLAL MEHTA | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JASWANTRAI RATILAL DOSHI | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
RAMESH JAMNADAS SHAH | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|||||
SANGEETA BAVISHA | Trustee | 06 October 2019 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.