Accounts and annual returns THE JOHN HOUGHTON TRUST FOR THE PARISH OF ST ANN RAINHILL
Charity number: 508976
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | COVID filing extension granted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | COVID filing extension granted | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 August 2021 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 08 August 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2018 | 24 January 2020 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2018 | 24 January 2020 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window