Trustees TRIMINGHAM VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity number: 1171637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY BROWN | Chair | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Bradford | Trustee | 28 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Patrick Mack | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Anthony William Lyons | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Pardon | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DERICK BOWLER | Trustee | 24 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK CARPMAEL | Trustee | 21 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.