Accounts and annual returns THE MARKET SANCTUARY
Charity number: 1171981
Charity reporting is overdue by 447 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 81 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 81 days | |
Annual return | 28 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 447 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 447 days | |
Annual return | 28 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 August 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 147 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 August 2019 | 17 November 2021 | 507 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 August 2019 | 22 November 2021 | 512 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window