273RD SHEFFIELD (HANDSWORTH) SCOUT GROUP

Charity number: 509052
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £17.42k £17.48k £38.89k £22.37k £22.89k
Total expenditure £23.60k £8.98k £32.27k £33.42k £20.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £1.25k