Financial history BEREAVED CHILDREN SUPPORT YORK

Charity number: 1171422
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022
Total gross income £12.28k £14.52k £16.60k £47.46k £18.03k
Total expenditure £7.72k £8.28k £9.84k £7.51k £12.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £600