MASJID HAYAT-UN-NABIY

Charity number: 1172406
Charity reporting is up to date (141 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2019 18 February 2021 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 18 February 2021 141 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2018 15 June 2020 259 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2018 15 June 2020 259 days late Download
Annual return 30 November 2017 15 June 2020 624 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2017 15 June 2020 624 days late Download