WESTHEAD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1171339
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 February 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 14 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 08 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 16 May 2018 On time Download