PROJECT FOOD

Charity number: 1173120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 22 December 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 10 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 10 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 04 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 10 May 2019 99 days late Download