Linked charities SAMARITANS OF MACCLESFIELD AND DISTRICT
Charity number: 1170130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 1976 AMENDED 2 MAY 1984 AS AMENDED 6 MAY 1992 AND 5 APRIL 1995 AND 16 APRIL 2008 AS AMENDED 12/4/11 AND 24/4/12
AS AMENDED ON 27 JAN 2016
AS AMENDED ON 01 APR 2017
Charitable objects
2.1 TO WORK FOR THE ASSISTANCE OF PERSONS WHO ARE SUICIDAL, DESPAIRING OR IN DISTRESS BY PROVIDING A SERVICE PRIMARILY INTENDED FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN MACCLESFIELD AND THE SURROUNDING AREA (BUT WITHOUT SPECIFIC LIMITATIONS AS TO AREA) TO ENABLE SUCH PERSONS TO RECEIVE IMMEDIATE HELP, COMPASSION AND BEFRIENDING FROM MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY SELECTED AND PREPARED FOR THE PURPOSE WORKING UNDER DIRECTION; AND ALSO WHERE APPROPRIATE, IN ACCORDANCE WITH SAMARITAN PROCEDURE, REFERRAL TO PERSONS HAVING SPECIALIST OR PROFESSIONAL SKILLS, AND
2.2 TO SUPPORT THE COMPANY AND AID IN THE ESTABLISHMENT AND SUPPORT OF PROBATIONARY
BRANCHES AND THE SUPPORT OF RECOGNISED BRANCHES OF SAMARITANS.
Area of benefit
MACCLESFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREA.
Registration history
- 12 March 1968 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.