Trustees THE GELERT TRUST
Charity number: 1171674
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Menzies | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Myles Jones | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bethan Gloster | Trustee | 21 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Seale | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Watkinson | Trustee | 11 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
LEWIS DITTRICH | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GOODWIN | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
NEIL EVANS | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN KERR | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALLAN | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN OWEN | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM FARR | Trustee | 17 February 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.