Trustees SETTLE AREA SWIMMING POOL
Charity number: 1171790
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Coleman | Chair | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Owen | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Moorehead | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Anne Galloway | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Robert Iain Crossley | Trustee | 12 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Smith | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hirst | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ian Orton | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Robert Anthony Brown | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
ROSIE SANDERSON | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.