Accounts and annual returns COALVILLE RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1171999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2022 20 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 20 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 20 June 2022 81 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 20 June 2022 81 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 08 April 2022 373 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 08 April 2022 373 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2019 08 April 2022 738 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 08 April 2022 738 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2018 08 April 2022 1104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 08 April 2022 1104 days late Download Open in new window