Financial history AGAPE

Charity number: 1173074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £357 £12.30k £1.06k £10.84k £791
Total expenditure £317 £3.02k £9.07k £7.35k £2.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £9.95k N/A