Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HOLY TRINITY WITH SAINT MARK, STOCKTON-ON-TEES
Charity number: 1173332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev PAUL NEVILLE | Chair | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Adela Stewart | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Elizabeth Curtis | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Edna Shirley Perkins | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Robertson | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander Patterson | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ebenezer Adekunle | Trustee | 25 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE KAY ROBINSON | Trustee | 08 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GEMMA ROBSON | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
CONSTANCE ROBINSON | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARK KENNEDY | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA DARLING | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE MERRICK | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN CRINSON | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY STEWART | Trustee | 06 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Blake | Trustee | 24 May 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.