Trustees MIDSOMER NORTON COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity number: 1180809
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NIKKI ERRINGTON | Chair | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Iles | Trustee | 27 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Smith | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Graham | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Richard John Jordan | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Charles Mackay | Trustee | 04 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN RICHARD PLANT | Trustee | 03 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
ALASTAIR SLADE | Trustee | 18 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA EILEEN ROBERTSON | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARY FLAGG | Trustee | 10 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.