Trustees THE PERRANWELL CENTRE
Charity number: 1170974
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Frankland | Chair | 18 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Fisher | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Angell | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Solley | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Christophers | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Guy Hanson | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Ward | Trustee | 21 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Morwenna Macindoe | Trustee | 19 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Mark Christopher Breach | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Chris John Aldridge Davie | Trustee | 06 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Colin Groom | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Hollingsworth | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anne Patricia Brazier | Trustee | 10 June 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.