Accounts and annual returns LIVERY SCHOOLS LINK (CIO)

Charity number: 1172347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 October 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 03 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 03 November 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 September 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1207 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 28 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window