Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE PARISH OF ST JOHN AND ST PAUL, WIDNES

Charity number: 1170687
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £160.45k £144.80k £177.72k £298.40k £586.96k
Total expenditure £167.59k £183.83k £160.65k £253.45k £279.88k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £5.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £60.28k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.46k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £339.84k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £33
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £167.35k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £279.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0