Accounts and annual returns CHRIST INSPIRED

Charity number: 1174378
Charity reporting is up to date (28 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 December 2021 15 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2021 03 November 2022 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 December 2020 15 January 2022 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2020 03 November 2022 393 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 December 2019 10 November 2020 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2019 10 November 2020 35 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 06 December 2018 20 January 2020 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 06 December 2018 20 January 2020 106 days late Download Open in new window