Trustees SPIKE PRINT STUDIO LTD
Charity number: 1175637
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
susie brooks | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Letitia Louise Bradley | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anna Spradbery | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Anne Hamilton | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dean Cooke | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
anna harley | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Prerna Chandiramani | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jess Rebecca Bugler | Trustee | 26 May 2021 |
|
|||||
JOHN JOSEPH FORD | Trustee | 25 July 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.